EP1003780 - HUMAN F11 ANTIGEN: A CELL SURFACE RECEPTOR INVOLVED IN PLATELET AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Shalley, Kant 2 Holly Court Lafayette Hill, PA 19444 / US | 02 /
PILLARISETTI, Kodandaram 49-A Marion Court Upper Darby, PA 19082 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98934426.2 | 10.07.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998US14371 | Priority number, date | US19970052186P | 10.07.1997 Original published format: US 52186 P | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902561 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003780 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/475, C12N15/09, C12N15/74, C12N15/79 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/22] | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHES F11 ANTIGEN, EIN ZELLOBERFLÄCHENREZEPTOR, DER AN DER PLÄTTCHENAGGREGATION BETEILIGT IST | [2000/22] | English: | HUMAN F11 ANTIGEN: A CELL SURFACE RECEPTOR INVOLVED IN PLATELET AGGREGATION | [2000/22] | French: | ANTIGENE F11 HUMAIN, CONSTITUANT UN RECEPTEUR DE SURFACE CELLULAIRE IMPLIQUE DANS L'AGREGATION PLAQUETTAIRE | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 23.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US5665701 (KORNECKI ELIZABETH H [US], et al); | [X] - KORNECKL E., ET AL., "ACTIVATION OF HUMAN PLATELETS BY A STIMULATORY MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19900615), vol. 265., no. 17., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 10042 - 10048., XP002912817 | [X] - NAIK U. P., ET AL., "MECHANISMS OF PLATELET ACTIVATION BY A STIMULATORY ANTIBODY: CROSS-LINKING OF A NOVEL PLATELET RECEPTOR FOR MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY F11 WITH THE FCGAMMARII RECEPTOR.", Biochemical Journal, Portland Press Ltd., GB, GB, (19950101), vol. 310., ISSN 0264-6021, pages 155 - 162., XP002912818 | [Y] - MIERENDORF R. C., PERCY C., YOUNG R. A., "GENE ISOLATION BY SCREENING LAMBDAGT11 LIBRARIES WITH ANTIBODIES.", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, US, (19870101), vol. 152., doi:10.1016/0076-6879(87)52054-7, ISSN 0076-6879, pages 458 - 469., XP002912819 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(87)52054-7 |