EP1016294 - RADIO TRANSMISSION METHOD AND CORDLESS PHONE MAINLY INTENDED FOR DECT STANDARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEDERMANN, Rolf Rekesland 2 D-46499 Hamminkeln / DE | [2000/27] | Application number, filing date | 98934778.6 | 25.05.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998DE01413 | Priority number, date | DE1997130984 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19730984 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9904586 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016294 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H04M1/72502 (EP);
H04B7/2656 (EP);
H04M2250/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | FUNK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND SCHNURLOSTELEFON, INSBESONDERE FÜR DECT-STANDARD | [2000/27] | English: | RADIO TRANSMISSION METHOD AND CORDLESS PHONE MAINLY INTENDED FOR DECT STANDARDS | [2000/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE RADIOTRANSMISSION ET TELEPHONE SANS FIL, NOTAMMENT POUR NORME DECT | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0680034 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4* the whole document *; | [A]US5537509 (SWAMINATHAN KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19546577 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9632817 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 19 - page 4, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE19515546 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 30; figure 1 * |