EP0988201 - DEVICE WITH REDUNDANT CHANNELS BETWEEN A SENSOR UNIT AND AN ANALYSIS UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHBERG, Peter Am Ringelsberg 7 D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 02 /
BURGDHARDT, Roland Buber-Neumann-Weg 106 D-60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 98934926.1 | 08.06.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998EP03417 | Priority number, date | DE1997125058 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19725058 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856631 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988201 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/88 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B60T8/17551 (EP);
B60G17/0185 (EP);
B60G17/0195 (EP);
B60T8/885 (EP);
B60G2600/042 (EP);
B60G2600/08 (EP);
B60G2800/016 (EP);
B60G2800/702 (EP);
B60G2800/80 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT REDUNDANTEN KANÄLEN ZWISCHEN EINER SENSOREINRICHTUNG UND EINER AUSWERTEEINRICHTUNG | [2000/13] | English: | DEVICE WITH REDUNDANT CHANNELS BETWEEN A SENSOR UNIT AND AN ANALYSIS UNIT | [2000/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF AVEC CANAUX REDONDANTS ENTRE UN DISPOSITIF DETECTEUR ET UN DISPOSITIF D'EVALUATION | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0283050 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 5 [Y] 3,4; | [YA]DE19525217 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [A]US5404304 (WISE WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4004086 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0649776 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 5 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4214642 |