EP1000145 - HEART AND SKELETON MUSCLE SPECIFIC NUCLEIC ACID, THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediGene Aktiengesellschaft Lochhamer Strasse 11 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2000/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Marion, Elke Albrecht-Dürer-Strasse 16 D-82152 Krailling / DE | 02 /
DOMDEY, Horst Fasanenweg 6 D-82061 Neuried / DE | 03 /
HENKEL, Thomas Freienfelsstrasse 20A D-81249 München / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 860 880 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98934959.2 | 15.06.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998EP03584 | Priority number, date | DE19971025186 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19725186 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856907 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000145 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/85, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, C07K16/18, G01N33/50, A61K48/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C12N2799/022 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | HERZ- UND SKELETTMUSKEL-SPEZIFISCHE NUKLEINSÄURE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2000/20] | English: | HEART AND SKELETON MUSCLE SPECIFIC NUCLEIC ACID, THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2000/20] | French: | ACIDE NUCLEIQUE SPECIFIQUE DES MUSCLES DU COEUR ET DU SQUELETTE, SA PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 04.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9717937 (FRANZ WOLFGANG M [DE], et al) [A] 4,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5283173 (FIELDS STANLEY [US], et al) [A] 15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MARRA ET AL., "THE WASHU-HHMI MOUSE EST PROJECT", EMBL, (1996), XP002084570 [Y] 1-15 | [Y] - LIEW, "cDNAs FROM HUMAN FETAL HEART", EMBL, (19970313), XP002084571 [Y] 1-15 | [Y] - WATAKABE ET AL., "N-TROPOMODULIN: A NOVEL ISOFORM OF TROPOMODULIN IDENTIFIED AS THE MAJOR BINDING PROTEIN TO BRAIN TROPOMYOSIN", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 109, pages 2299 - 2310, XP002084565 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - BABCOCK AND FOWLER, "ISOFORM-SPECIFIC INTERACTION OF TROPOMODULIN WITH SKELETAL MUSCLE AND ERYTHROCYTE TROPOMYOSINS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 269, no. 44, pages 27510 - 27518, XP002084566 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [DY] - LIANG P ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL DISPLAY OF EUKARYOTIC MESSENGER RNA BY MEANS OF THE POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", SCIENCE, (19920814), vol. 257, no. 5072, pages 967 - 971, XP000508268 [DY] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1354393 | [DA] - TANAKA ET AL., "CONSTRUCTION OF A NORMALIZED DIRECTIONALLY CLONED cDNA LIBRARY FROM ADULT HEART AND ANALYSIS OF 3040 CLONES BY PARTIAL SEQUENCING", GENOMICS, vol. 35, pages 231 - 235, XP002084567 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1996.0344 | [A] - NABEL E G, "GENE THERAPY FOR CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE", CIRCULATION, (19950115), vol. 91, no. 2, pages 541 - 548, XP000568740 [A] 4,11,12 * the whole document * | [PY] - MARRA ET AL., "THE WASHU-HHMI MOUSE EST PROJECT", EMBL, (19970613), XP002084569 [PY] 1-15 |