EP1002076 - PROTEINS MEDIATING SWITCH RECOMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 24 4070 Basle / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | ||
For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 24 4070 Basle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WABL, Matthias 1515 5th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 02 /
JESSBERGER, Rolf Bahnhofstrasse 101 D-79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98935224.0 | 16.07.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998IB01191 | Priority number, date | EP19970112326 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97112326 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903991 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002076 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68, C07K16/18, A01K67/027, A61K48/00 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | KLASSENWECHSELREKOMBINATION-VERMITTELNDE PROTEINE | [2000/21] | English: | PROTEINS MEDIATING SWITCH RECOMBINATION | [2000/21] | French: | PROTEINES MEDIATRICES DE LA RECOMBINAISON DE COMMUTATIONS | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/47] | 10.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2000 | 31.07.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - MARRA M ET AL., "Mus musculus cDNA clone 819985 (AC AA437805)", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG, GERMANY, (19970601), XP002088394 [X] 1-6,17,18 * the whole document * | [X] - HILLIER L ET AL., "Pancreatic islet Homo sapiens clone 328253 (AC W39285)", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG, GERMANY, (19960517), XP002088395 [X] 1-6,17,18 * the whole document * | [A] - JESSBERGER R ET AL., "A mammalian protein complex that repairs double-strand breaks and deletions by recombination", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19930715), vol. 268, no. 20, pages 15070 - 15079, XP002088396 [A] * the whole document * | [PX] - BORGGREFE T ET AL., "A B-cell-specific DNA recombination complex", JOURNAL BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19980703), vol. 273, no. 27, pages 17025 - 17035, XP002088397 [PX] 1-9,11-17,19,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.27.17025 |