Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010022265 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9814958 | 20.07.1998 | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001511584 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9814958 | 20.07.1998 | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8499898 | Global Dossier | 16.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9814958 | 20.07.1998 | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0998748 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | B1 | EP0998748 | 10.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9814958 | 20.07.1998 | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE308113T | 15.11.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9814958 | 20.07.1998 | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69832072D1 | 01.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9814958 | 20.07.1998 | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9905694 | Global Dossier | 04.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5854822 | 29.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US90060997 | 25.07.1997 |