EP1016144 - THIN FILM SPATIAL FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Displays, Inc. 6780 Cortona Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | [2002/34] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states UNIAX CORPORATION 6780 Cortona Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCELVAIN, Jon, S. 602 Alameda Padre Serra Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | 02 /
LANGAN, John, L. 1539 Cliff Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | 03 /
HEEGER, Alan, J. 1042 Las Alturas Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98935856.9 | 21.07.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US15029 | Priority number, date | US19970053572P | 21.07.1997 Original published format: US 53572 P | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9904438 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016144 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/24, H01L27/146, H01L27/144, H01L27/00 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
H01L27/00 (EP,US);
H10K19/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | H01L35/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | DÜNNFILM-RAUMFILTER | [2000/27] | English: | THIN FILM SPATIAL FILTERS | [2000/27] | French: | FILTRES SPATIAUX A FILM MINCE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 28.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03253075 ; | [X]JPH02250474 ; | [A]EP0651444 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 14 ** figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5567957 (BIEGELSEN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 3,9,10 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XY]EP0739038 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 41 * * column 6, line 39 - column 9, line 37 * * figure 6 * [Y] 3,9,10; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920210), vol. 016, no. 052, Database accession no. (E - 1164), & JP03253075 A 19911112 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901221), vol. 014, no. 576, Database accession no. (E - 1016), & JP02250474 A 19901008 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - MAHOWALD M A ET AL, "THE SILICON RETINA", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN,US,SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN INC. NEW YORK, (19910501), vol. 264, no. 5, ISSN 0036-8733, pages 40 - 46, XP002052755 [X] 1 * page 42 * * page 43, column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 10 * | International search | [X]US5130775 (MAEDA SHOSAKU [JP], et al); | [A]US5232631 (CAO YONG [US], et al); | [X]US5315100 (KOBAYASHI AKIRA [JP], et al); | [AE]US5804836 (HEEGER ALAN J [US], et al) |