EP0990240 - ELECTRIC CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPCOS AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | [2000/28] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS GmbH & CO. KG Balanstrasse 73 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHEL, Hartmut Am Hahnenschnabel 13/1 D-89520 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm, et al Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Epping Hermann & Peter Postfach 12 10 26 80034 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98936187.8 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998DE01643 | Priority number, date | DE1997125843 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19725843 | [2000/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858396 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990240 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990240 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01G2/08 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
H01G2/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER KONDENSATOR | [2000/14] | English: | ELECTRIC CAPACITOR | [2000/14] | French: | CONDENSATEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4331377 (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]DE29617888U (F & T KONDENSATOREN GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document * |