blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977942

EP0977942 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / RIPPER, Wolfgang
Maximilianstrasse 9
D-70327 Stuttgart / DE
02 / WAGNER, Werner
Silcherstrasse 11
D-70839 Gerlingen / DE
03 / DITTUS, Bernd
Am Reitweg 24
D-71732 Tamm / DE
04 / MACK, Manfred
Hinter der Mauer 13
D-89174 Altheim / DE
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date98936193.617.06.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998DE01649
Priority number, dateDE199715249627.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19752496
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9928616
Date:10.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977942
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:F02M45/12, F02M61/20
[2000/06]
CPC:
F02M45/12 (EP,US); F02M61/205 (EP,US); F02M2200/304 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/06]
TitleGerman:KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN[2000/06]
English:FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES[2000/06]
French:SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase27.08.1999National basic fee paid 
27.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
08.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/35]
26.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2088948  (VYSOKE UCENI TECH BRNE) [X] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 101 - page 2, line 19; figure 1 *;
 [X]US3738576  (O'NEILL C) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0017872  (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) [A] 4 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE4440182  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4440182
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.