EP0987939 - A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR MOVING CHICKENS OR OTHER POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lacosin N.V. Moorseelsesteenweg 228 8800 Rumbeke/Roeselare / BE | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Lacotrans N.V. Moorseelsesteenweg 228 8800 Rumbeke/roeselare / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPERE, Geert, Lodewijk Moorseelsesteenweg 224 B-8800 Rumbeke/Roeselare / BE | 02 /
LAPERE, Frank, Raymond Duizendzinnenstraat 1 B-8800 Rumbeke/Roeselare / BE | 03 /
LAPERE, Bart, Paul Duizendzinnenstraat 1A B-8800 Rumbeke/Roeselare / BE | 04 /
LAPERE, Jan, Robert Moorseelsesteenweg 230 B-8800 Rumbeke/Roeselare / BE | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/13] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98936358.5 | 08.06.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998EP03660 | Priority number, date | NL19971006278 | 11.06.1997 Original published format: NL 1006278 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856245 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987939 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987939 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01K45/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
A01K45/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON HÜHNERN ODER ANDEREM GEFLÜGEL | [2000/13] | English: | A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR MOVING CHICKENS OR OTHER POULTRY | [2000/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DEPLACER DES POULETS OU D'AUTRES VOLAILLES | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03076619.0 / EP1344453 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2000 | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2001 | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.06.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/46] | DK | 30.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2063183 (MARKS & SPENCER LTD) [X] 1,2,5,8,25,28,31,33 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0161116 (TAMNAHARRY DEV [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,25,28,29,31,34,35 * the whole document * [A] 11-13; | [A]WO9408451 (AMERICAN CALAN INC [US]); | [A]US5385117 (HOLLIS CALVIN L [US], et al); | [XA]EP0713642 (ANGLIA AUTOFLOW LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,9,25,27-29,31,35 * the whole document * [A] 10,11,13,36,38,39; | [A]US5592902 (HORTON HERBERT D [US]) |