EP1011918 - MACHINE-TOOL ASSEMBLY FOR SUBSTANTIALLY SIMULTANEOUS MACHINING OF A SHEET METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeandeaud, Jean-Claude Le Pan Perdu 38080 Saint Marcel Bel Accueil / FR | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2000/26] | Hartmann, Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau, B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98936468.2 | 07.07.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998FR01461 | Priority number, date | FR19970008817 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9708817 | [2000/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902301 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011918 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1011918 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q39/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
B23Q39/022 (EP);
B21D28/00 (EP);
B23Q1/621 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINENEINHEIT ZUM IM WESENTLICH SIMULTANEN BEARBEITEN EINES BLECHES | [2000/26] | English: | MACHINE-TOOL ASSEMBLY FOR SUBSTANTIALLY SIMULTANEOUS MACHINING OF A SHEET METAL | [2000/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MACHINES-OUTILS DESTINE A USINER SENSIBLEMENT SIMULTANEMENT UNE T LE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2002 | GB | 13.02.2002 | IT | 13.02.2002 | NL | 13.02.2002 | SE | 13.05.2002 | DE | 14.05.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | ES | 29.08.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 13.02.2002 | |
GB | 13.02.2002 | ||
NL | 13.02.2002 | ||
SE | 13.05.2002 | ||
DE | 14.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 29.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 13.02.2002 | |
GB | 13.02.2002 | ||
NL | 13.02.2002 | ||
SE | 13.05.2002 | ||
DE | 14.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 13.02.2002 | |
GB | 13.02.2002 | ||
NL | 13.02.2002 | ||
SE | 13.05.2002 | ||
DE | 14.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 13.02.2002 | |
GB | 13.02.2002 | ||
NL | 13.02.2002 | ||
SE | 13.05.2002 | ||
DE | 14.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 13.02.2002 | |
GB | 13.02.2002 | ||
NL | 13.02.2002 | ||
SE | 13.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 13.02.2002 | |
SE | 13.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 13.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4113629 (GOETZ METALL ANLAGEN [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2262461 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0634237 (AMADA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]DE4328801 (PRAEWEMA WERKZEUGMASCHINENFABR [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |