04.07.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
27.07.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.09.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2005 |
First examination report |
|
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.07.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
29.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.03.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
31.03.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
27.03.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
21.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|