Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8549498 | Global Dossier | 22.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9802251 | 28.07.1998 | EP97305799 | 31.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1000498 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2007 | B1 | EP1000498 | 17.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802251 | 28.07.1998 | EP97305799 | 31.07.1997 | EP98936523 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69838330T | 21.05.2008 | T2 | DE69838330D1 | 11.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802251 | 28.07.1998 | EP97305799 | 31.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6233312 | 15.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802251 | 28.07.1998 | EP97305799 | 31.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9907129 | Global Dossier | 11.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97305799 | 31.07.1997 |