Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1002357
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.08.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
07.09.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] |
03.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.05.2001 |
First examination report |
|
27.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.04.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
07.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
07.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|