Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002527015 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US90654897 | 05.08.1997 | GB9802294 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8552398 | Global Dossier | 01.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US90654897 | 05.08.1997 | GB9802294 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1002357 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2001 | B1 | EP1002357 | 24.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90654897 | 05.08.1997 | GB9802294 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69802196T | 04.07.2002 | T2 | DE69802196D1 | 29.11.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US90654897 | 05.08.1997 | GB9802294 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9908365 | Global Dossier | 18.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90654897 | 05.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5793143 | 11.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US90654897 | 05.08.1997 |