EP1002357 - ROTOR FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | For all designated states Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YORK, Michael, Timothy 1643 South Fletcher Road Chelsea, MI 48118 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Richard, Kenneth 2098 Metzner Walled Lake, MI 48390 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98936561.4 | 31.07.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998GB02294 | Priority number, date | US19970906548 | 05.08.1997 Original published format: US 906548 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908365 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002357 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002357 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K21/04, H02K9/06 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H02K1/243 (EP,US);
H02K21/044 (EP,US);
H02K9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/21] | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2000/21] | English: | ROTOR FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2000/21] | French: | ROTOR POUR MACHINE ELECTRIQUE | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0762601 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 5; figure 35; claim 1 * [A] 2,5,10; | [X]JPH04165950 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920928), vol. 016, no. 465, Database accession no. (E - 1270), & JP04165950 A 19920611 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * | Examination | JPH04165950 |