Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1091164
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.08.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |
09.05.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
22.11.2002 |
First examination report |
|
20.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.05.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
07.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
23.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
02.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
18.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|