Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4021621B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP9803483 | 05.08.1998 | JP18285898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1091164 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2002 | A4 | EP1091164 | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9803483 | 05.08.1998 | JP18285898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6530907 | 11.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9803483 | 05.08.1998 | JP18285898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0000768 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP18285898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100543620B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2006 | B1 | KR20010053227 | 25.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18285898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1105850C | 16.04.2003 | C | CN1299454 | 13.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18285898 | 29.06.1998 |