EP1009861 - GENE EXPRESSION AND EVALUATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. (a California Corporation) 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALABAN, David, J. 10224 Pennisula Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/25] | 01 /
BALABAN, David, J. 37 Bret Harte Road San Rafael, CA 94901 / US | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98936972.3 | 24.07.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US15151 | Priority number, date | US19970053842 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: US 53842 | US19970069198 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: US 69198 | US19970069436 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: US 69436 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905323 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009861 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G06F17/30, G06F159/00, G06F19/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
H04M1/006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
G16B25/30 (EP,US);
G16B50/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M2207/206 (EP,US);
H04M3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
Y10S128/922 (EP,US);
Y10S707/925 (US);
Y10S707/955 (US);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | C12Q1/68, G06F17/30, G06F159/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | GENEXPRESSION UND EVALUIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/25] | English: | GENE EXPRESSION AND EVALUATION SYSTEM | [2000/25] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXPRESSION ET D'EVALUATION DE GENES | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - MILLER G ET AL, "IMAGE cDNA Clones, UniGene Clustering, and ACeDB: An Integrated Resource for Expressed Sequence Information", GENOME RESEARCH, vol. 7, no. 10, (199710), pages 1027 - 1032, URL: http://www.genome.org/cgi/reprint/7/10/1027.pdf, (20020814), XP002210119 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * | [X] - LENNON G ET AL, "THE I.M.A.G.E. CONSORTIUM: AN INTEGRATED MOLECULAR ANALYSIS OF GENOMES AND THEIR EXPRESSION", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (19960401), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 151 - 152, XP000608992 [X] 1-10,13-23,26,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1996.0177 | [X] - LADEANA HILLIER ET AL, "Generation and analysis of 280,000 human expressed sequence tags", PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, COLD SPRING HARBOR, NY, US, (199609), vol. 6, no. 9, ISSN 1054-9803, pages 807 - 828, XP002140684 [X] 1-10,13-23,26,27 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9623078 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X] - OKUBO K., ET AL., "LARGE SCALE CDNA SEQUENCING FOR ANALYSIS OF QUANTITATIVE AND QUALITATIVE ASPECTS OF GENE EXPRESSION.", NATURE GENETICS., Nature Publishing Group, NEW YORK, US, NEW YORK, US, (19931101), vol. 02., no. 03., doi:10.1038/ng1192-173, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 173 - 179., XP002913265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1192-173 | [Y] - "ADVANCED TRAINING MANUAL, PASSAGE.", ADVANCED TRAINING MANUAL, XX, XX, XX, (19930101), pages 1.06 - 1.19 + 2.09, XP002913266 |