EP0998760 - SOLID-STATE ENERGY STORAGE MODULE EMPLOYING INTEGRATED INTERCONNECT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | For all designated states Hydro-Quebec Corporation 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
For all designated states Hydro-Quebec Corporation 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | |||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
For all designated states Hydro-Quebec Corporation 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | |||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427, St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
For all designated states Hydro-Quebec Corporation 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montreal, Quebec H2Z 1A4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUILLARD, Jean 41 Germain Saint-Luc, Quebec J2W 1J5 / CA | 02 /
COMTE, Christophe 4560 St.-Hubert Montreal, Quebec H2J 2X3 / CA | 03 /
DAIGLE, Dominik 89 Dorion St-Hyacinthe, Quebec J2S 8S1 / CA | 04 /
HAGEN, Ronald, A. 9980 Keswick Avenue North Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | 05 /
KNUDSON, Orlin, B. 652 Marble Street Vadnais Heights, MN 55127 / US | 06 /
MORIN, Andre Suite 5,2805 Belcourt Longueuil, Quebec J4M 1X7 / CA | 07 /
RANGER, Michel 640 Terrasse Du Ruisseau 302 Lachine, Quebec H8T 3L6 / CA | 08 /
ROSS, Guy 328 Mgr-Bourget Beloeil, Quebec J3J 3L7 / CA | 09 /
ROUILLARD, Roger 315 Prevert Beloeil, Quebec J3G 2C9 / CA | 10 /
ST-GERMAIN, Philippe 533 Rockland Outremont, Quebec H2V 2Z4 / CA | 11 /
SUDANO, Anthony 5027 Curie Laval, Quebec H7W 4V7 / CA | 12 /
TURGEON, Thomas, A. 1650 Camelot Lane Fridley, MN 55432 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98937006.9 | 23.07.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US15224 | Priority number, date | US19970900427 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: US 900427 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905731 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998760 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998760 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H05K3/32 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
H01M10/0413 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/653 (EP,US);
H01M10/6553 (EP,US);
H01M10/6554 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
H01M10/656 (EP,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/293 (EP,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,US);
H01M50/503 (EP,US);
H01M10/0445 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/659 (EP,US);
H01M10/667 (EP,US);
H01M2200/00 (EP,US);
H01M2200/103 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
H01M50/50 (EP,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
H01M50/583 (EP,US);
H01M6/181 (EP,US);
H01M6/5016 (EP,US);
H05K1/117 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/14] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FESTKORPER-ENERGIESPEICHERMODUL MIT INTEGRIERTE LEITERPLATTE | [2000/19] | English: | SOLID-STATE ENERGY STORAGE MODULE EMPLOYING INTEGRATED INTERCONNECT BOARD | [2000/19] | French: | MODULE DE STOCKAGE D'ENERGIE TRANSISTORISE A CARTE D'INTERCONNEXION INTEGREE | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 13.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.10.2006 | SE | 11.01.2007 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/29] | SE | 11.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1582979 (CELAYA EMPARANZA GALDOS SA) [A] 1,7,9,10,13-15,19-24,27,28 * column 2, line 99 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,2,4; claims 1,4,8 *; | [A]DE3246968 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [A] 1,14 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5180641 (BURNS JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 5,16* figures 2,5; claim 5 *; | [A]EP0643429 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1,14 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |