EP0998719 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE SEGMENTATION OF LUNG REGIONS IN LATERAL CHEST RADIOGRAPHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arch Development Corporation 5640 South Ellis Avenue, Room 405 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Arch Development Corporation 5640 South Ellis Avenue, Room 405 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMATO, Samuel, G., III 9142 S. Oakley Avenue Chicago, IL 60620 / US | 02 /
GIGER, Maryellen, L. 265 Claremont Elmhurst, IL 60126 / US | 03 /
MACMAHON, Heber 2144 N. Cleveland Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98937064.8 | 24.07.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US15351 | Priority number, date | US19970900189 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: US 900189 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905640 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998719 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T5/00 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/136 (EP,US);
G06V10/28 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SEGMENTIERUNG DES LUNGENBEREICHS BEI LATERALER THORAX-RADIOGRAPHIE | [2003/26] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE SEGMENTATION OF LUNG REGIONS IN LATERAL CHEST RADIOGRAPHS | [2000/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE SEGMENTATION DES REGIONS PULMONAIRES DANS LES RADIOGRAPHIES THORACIQUES LATERALES | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/19] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR EINTEILUNG VON TEILEN DER LUNGE BEI LATERALER THORAX-RADIOGRAPHIE | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - XU X -W ET AL, "IMAGE FEATURE ANALYSIS FOR COMPUTER-AIDED DIAGNOSIS: DETECTION OF RIGHT AND LEFT HEMIDIAPHRAGM EDGES AND DELINEATION OF LUNG FIELD INCHEST RADIOGRAPHS", MEDICAL PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19960901), vol. 23, no. 9, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1613 - 1624, XP000617361 [Y] 1-4,18,26,27,31,44-51 * abstract * * page 614, paragraph II.A - page 1620, paragraph II.E * [A] 5-14,16,17,19-25,28-30,32-43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.597738 | [YA] - CHENG S N C ET AL, "AUTOMATED SEGMENTATION OF REGIONS OF INTEREST ON HAND RADIOGRAPHS", MEDICAL PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19940801), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1293 - 1300, XP000466010 [Y] 1-4,18,26,27,31,44-51 * abstract * * page 1296, paragraph E * [A] 5-14,16,17,19-25,28-30,32-43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.597402 | International search | [Y]US4907156 (DOI KUNIO [US], et al); | [Y]US5133020 (GIGER MARYELLEN L [US], et al); | [Y]US5452367 (BICK ULRICH [US], et al); | [Y]US5537485 (NISHIKAWA ROBERT M [US], et al); | [Y]US5638458 (GIGER MARYELLEN L [US], et al); | [YP]US5657362 (GIGER MARYELLEN L [US], et al) |