EP0998512 - LARGE POLYESTER CONTAINERS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRAYBERRY, Harold, Blake 252 Ascot Drive Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Brown, Fraser Gregory James Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/19] | Evans, David Charles fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98937131.5 | 24.07.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US15467 | Priority number, date | US19970053717P | 25.07.1997 Original published format: US 53717 P | US19980106294 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 106294 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905197 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998512 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998512 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0998512 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/185, C08G63/189, B29C49/08, B65D1/02 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP,US);
C08G63/189 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/19] | Title | German: | GROSSE POLYESTERBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/19] | English: | LARGE POLYESTER CONTAINERS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2000/19] | French: | GRANDS RECIPIENTS EN POLYESTER ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04028382.2 / EP1518876 | EP04028385.5 / EP1518877 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 20.01.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.07.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.09.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.02.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 05.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5217128 (STENGER DONALD R [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 22-26 * * column 3, lines 46-47 * * column 3, lines 61-62 * * column 4, lines 56-57; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-18; | [Y]WO9108247 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 2-18 * page 4, paragraph 2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9503977 (PETROU NICOLEON [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 9-11 *; | [Y]EP0278403 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 2-18 * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 8; example 3 *; | [Y]WO9003993 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 2-18 * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9633062 (COCA COLA CO [US], et al) [Y] 2-18 * page 14, lines 14-15 * * page 9, lines 5-8 * * page 11, lines 29-30 *; | [Y]WO9401268 (CONTINENTAL PET TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [Y] 2-18 * page 16, paragraph L * * page P28, lines 11-12 * | Opposition | EP0543265 | - Comprehensive Polymer Science (Editors Allen & Bevington), Volume 7, Chapter 15 "Blow Molding of Polymers", by Samuel L Belcher, published January 1989, pp 489-513 |