EP1007673 - NOVEL BONE MINERALIZATION PROTEINS, DNA, VECTORS, EXPRESSION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University 1380 South Oxford Road, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states EMORY UNIVERSITY 1380 South Oxford Road, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states EMORY UNIVERSITY 1380 South Oxford Road Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAIR, Greg 1887 Chrysler Drive, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30345 / US | 02 /
BODEN, Scott 2842 Cravey Drive, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30345 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | O'Connell, Maura, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98937281.8 | 29.07.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US15814 | Priority number, date | US19970054219P | 30.07.1997 Original published format: US 54219 P | US19980080407P | 02.04.1998 Original published format: US 80407 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906563 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007673 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007673 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C12N15/86, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K48/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C07K14/51 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2799/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | NEUE KNOCHENMINERALISIERUNGSPROTEINE, DNA, VEKTOREN, EXPRESSIONSSYSTEME | [2000/24] | English: | NOVEL BONE MINERALIZATION PROTEINS, DNA, VECTORS, EXPRESSION SYSTEMS | [2000/24] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTEINE DE MINERALISATION OSSEUSE, ADN, VECTEURS ET SYSTEMES D'EXPRESSIONS | [2000/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | LU | 29.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
LU | 29.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5504192 (GILL GORDON N [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,45,46 * figures 5,6 *; | [PX] - LIU Y ET AL, "BMP6 induces a novel LIM protein involved in bone mineralisation and osteocalcin secretion", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, (199708), vol. 12 (supp.), page 49, XP002083263 [PX] 1-12,15,18,21,22,43,45,46 * the whole document * | [DA] - BODEN S ET AL, "Glucocorticoid-induced differentiation of fetal rat calvarial osteoblasts is mediated by Bone Morphogenetic Protein-6", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (199707), vol. 138, no. 7, pages 2820 - 2828, XP002083264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.138.7.2820 | [DA] - BODEN S ET AL, "Differential effects and glucocorticoid potentiation of Bone Morphogenetic Protein action during rat osteoblast differentiation in vitro", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (199608), vol. 137, no. 8, pages 3401 - 3407, XP002083265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.137.8.3401 | [A] - SHAWLOT W AND BEHRINGER R, "Requirement for Lim1 in head-organizer function", NATURE., (19950330), vol. 374, pages 425 - 430, XP002083776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374425a0 | [A] - DE ROBERTIS E. M., "Dismantling the organizer", NATURE., (19950330), vol. 374, pages 407 - 408, XP002083777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374407a0 |