14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
30.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
15.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
01.04.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
18.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
28.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
24.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
09.04.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
01.04.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.04.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.09.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
First examination report |
|
15.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.05.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
19.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
04.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|