Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8603598 | Global Dossier | 12.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US92962197 | 19.09.1997 | US9815836 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1015418 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2004 | B1 | EP1015418 | 05.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92962197 | 19.09.1997 | US9815836 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE267802T | 15.06.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US92962197 | 19.09.1997 | US9815836 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69824191T | 04.05.2005 | T2 | DE69824191D1 | 01.07.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US92962197 | 19.09.1997 | US9815836 | 31.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9915495 | Global Dossier | 01.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92962197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5891919 | 06.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US92962197 | 19.09.1997 |