EP1015418 - DENATONIUM CAPSAICINATE AND METHODS OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burlington Bio-Medical & Scientific Corp. 222 Sherwood Avenue Farmingdale, NY 11735-1718 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUM, Melvin 1385 Lyon Place Wantagh, NY 11794 / US | 02 /
ROITBERG, Michael 111 North Ninth Avenue Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98937289.1 | 31.07.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US15836 | Priority number, date | US19970929621 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: US 929621 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9915495 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015418 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015418 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/04, A01N37/44, A61K31/165, C09D7/12 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
A01N33/12 (EP,US);
A01N37/44 (EP,US);
C07C233/20 (EP,US);
C07C237/06 (EP,US);
C09D5/1625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | DENATONIUM CAPSAICINAT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/27] | English: | DENATONIUM CAPSAICINATE AND METHODS OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/27] | French: | DENATONIUM CAPSAICINATE ET SES METHODES DE PRODUCTION | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2004 | BE | 26.05.2004 | CH | 26.05.2004 | CY | 26.05.2004 | FI | 26.05.2004 | IT | 26.05.2004 | LI | 26.05.2004 | NL | 26.05.2004 | LU | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | IE | 03.08.2004 | DK | 26.08.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | SE | 26.08.2004 | ES | 06.09.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
CY | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
IE | 03.08.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
IE | 03.08.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
IE | 03.08.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
LI | 26.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4005038 (MINKOFF WALTER) [AD] 1-3,7-15 * column A *; | [A]GB2097791 (GLAXO GROUP LTD) [A] 1-3,7-15 * page 1 *; | [D]US4438046 (GREW EDWARD L [GB], et al); | [AD]US4661504 (HOLLANDER GARY T [US], et al) [AD] 1,3-15 * column A *; | [A]US4997853 (BERNSTEIN JOEL E [US]) [A] 1,3,4,9 * abstract *; | [A]US5008289 (BERNSTEIN JOEL E [US]) [A] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0458177 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,7-15 * page 2 - page 8 *; | [A]WO9402558 (HURME CONSULTING OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,3,6-15 * abstract *; | [D]US5456916 (KURATA MITSUO [JP], et al) |