EP1035923 - ROLLER MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states BÜHLER AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSTETTLER, Rene Oberdorfstrasse 15 CH-8370 Sirnach / CH | [2000/38] | Application number, filing date | 98937388.1 | 19.08.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998CH00352 | Priority number, date | DE19971053958 | 05.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19753958 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929430 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035923 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035923 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/42 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B02C4/42 (EP,KR,US);
B02C4/286 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [2000/38] | Title | German: | WALZENSTUHL | [2000/38] | English: | ROLLER MILL | [2000/38] | French: | MOULIN A CYLINDRES | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2086659 (ARMSTRONG WALTER J) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1460628 (CLAYSON NV) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]GB2115722 (SIMON LTD HENRY) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9014165 (OCRIM SPA [IT]) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5566902 (THOM JR KELSEY C [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | IT1198054 | DE1107033 | US3338107 | DE3304832 | EP0334919 | EP0425626 | DE2730166 |