blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968511

EP0968511 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.09.2000 [2000/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BEERENS, Marinus, Nicolaas, Maria
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / GEHRING, Frederic, Christiaan
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / THEELEN, Gerardus, Wilhelmus, Maria
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / VAN MARREWIJK, Richard, Nicolaas
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M., et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M., et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/01]Koppen, Jan
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date98937697.519.08.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998IB01273
Priority number, dateEP1997020297629.09.1997         Original published format: EP 97202976
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9917328
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968511
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01J9/227, H01J9/22
[2000/01]
CPC:
H01J9/227 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINER BESCHICHTUNG[2000/01]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR APPLIQUER UN REVETEMENT[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase29.06.1999National basic fee paid 
29.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
17.07.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/36]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0598415  ;
 [Y]CN1122050  ;
 [A]US5272118  ;
 [A]GB2236428
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.