EP1005458 - CARBOSTYRIL DERIVATIVES FOR INHIBITING SKIN ERYTHEMA AND/OR SKIN PIGMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 2-9, Kanda-Tsukasacho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 2-9, Kanda-Tsukasacho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIRO, Yasuo 61, Yoshinohoncho 6-chome Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-0802 / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Takao 2-28, Aza Tarohachisu Sotobiraki, Kitajimacho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0202 / JP | 03 /
KUWAHARA, Keiichi 1201-20, Shioya Ako-shi, Hyogo 678-0201 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Kozo 11-19, Tanakacho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0081 / JP | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98937851.8 | 18.08.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998JP03657 | Priority number, date | JP19970222431 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22243197 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909011 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005458 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005458 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/26, A61K31/47, C07D215/22, C07D405/12 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
C07D215/227 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
C07D215/26 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Title | German: | CARBOSTYRYLDERIVATE ZUR INHIBITION VON HAUTRÖTUNGEN UND/ODER VON HAUTPIGMENTIERUNG | [2000/23] | English: | CARBOSTYRIL DERIVATIVES FOR INHIBITING SKIN ERYTHEMA AND/OR SKIN PIGMENTATION | [2000/23] | French: | DERIVES DE CARBOSTYRILE SERVANT A INHIBER L'ERYTHEME ET/OU LA PIGMENTATION DE LA PEAU | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0081782 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1,17,19 * page 3, lines 3-9; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0467325 (SYNTEX INC [US]) [DA] 1 * page 30-31: preparation 7, 8 *; | JPH04234386 [ ] (SYNTEX INC); | WO9322317 [ ] (KOWA CO [JP], et al); | [DA]EP0638571 (KOWA CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * page 102, refernce example 21 *; | [A]WO9602508 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,17,19 * claims 1,37,38 *; | [A] - BLONDET, DOMINIQUE ET AL., "Convenient synthesis of 6-methyl, 8-methyl and 6,8-dimethyl derivatives of 5-hydroxy-1,2,3,4-tetrahydro-2-quinolone.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930830), vol. 119, no. 9, Database accession no. 95292j, XP002081977 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - ORG. PREP. PROCED. INT., vol. 25, no. 2, pages 223 - 228 |