EP1002383 - MULTI-WAVELENGTH CROSS-CONNECT OPTICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chorum Technologies, Inc. Suite 200, 1155 East Collins Boulevard Richardson, TX 75081 / US | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Kuang-Yi Suite 200, 1155 East Collins Boulevard Richardson, TX 75081 / US | 02 /
LIU, Jian-Yu Suite 200, 1155 East Collins Boulevard Richardson, TX 75081 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al Baker Botts 41 Lothbury London EC2R 7HF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al Baker Botts 99 Gresham Street London EC2V 7BA / GB | ||
Former [2000/21] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98938062.1 | 28.07.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998US15618 | Priority number, date | US19970907551 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: US 907551 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908403 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002383 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/00, H04Q11/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
G02B6/272 (EP);
G02B6/29302 (EP);
G02B6/29395 (EP);
H04Q11/0005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | H04B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | MULTIWELLENLÄNGEN OPTISCHES QUERVERBINDUNGSNETZWERK | [2000/21] | English: | MULTI-WAVELENGTH CROSS-CONNECT OPTICAL NETWORK | [2000/21] | French: | RESEAU OPTIQUE A SOUS-REPARTITION A LONGUEURS D'ONDES MULTIPLES | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 28.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5414540 (PATEL JAYANTILAL S [US], et al) [A] 1,13,21,29* abstract *; | [PA]US5694233 (WU KUANG-YI [US], et al) [PA] 1,13,21,29 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4650289 (KUWAHARA HIDEO [JP]); | [A]US5013140 (HEALEY PETER [GB], et al); | [A]US5162944 (YAMAMOTO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5363228 (DEJULE MICHAEL C [US], et al) |