EP1000283 - IMPROVED RETAINING STRUCTURE FOR A FUEL TANK MOUNTED VALVE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center Cleveland Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEADFORD, Gary, H. 42351 Glencove Court Canton, MI 48188 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98938108.2 | 29.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998US15757 | Priority number, date | US19970902838 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: US 902838 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906745 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000283 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000283 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/36, B60K15/035 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B60K15/03519 (EP,US);
F16K17/36 (KR);
B60K2015/03453 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0874 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86324 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | F16K17/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VENTILKÖRPER, DER IN EINEM KRAFTSTOFFTANK MONTIERT IST | [2000/20] | English: | IMPROVED RETAINING STRUCTURE FOR A FUEL TANK MOUNTED VALVE BODY | [2000/20] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MAINTIEN AMELIOREE POUR UN CORPS DE SOUPAPE MONTE DANS UN RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 12.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5139043 (HYDE JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11,12,14 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5404907 (BENJEY ROBERT P [US], et al); | [A]US4779637 (UBALDI RAYMOND [FR]); | [A]US5139043 (HYDE JAMES P [US], et al) | by applicant | US5404907 |