EP0975888 - PINLESS INTERNAL AUTOMATIC ADJUSTER FOR BRAKE PISTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. Law Department, P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERWANGER, Fred, W. 2644 Arabian Court 3A St. Joseph, IN 46628 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98938274.2 | 03.08.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998US16082 | Priority number, date | US19970905246 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: US 905246 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906729 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975888 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975888 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/54 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D65/543 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/05] | Title | German: | STIFTLOSE, INTERNE, AUTOMATISCHE NACHSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR BREMSKOLBEN | [2000/05] | English: | PINLESS INTERNAL AUTOMATIC ADJUSTER FOR BRAKE PISTON | [2000/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE INTERNE SANS AXE POUR PISTON DE FREIN | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.1999 | 11.06.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.1999 | 11.06.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.1999 | 11.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1625763 (LANCIA & C FABBRICA ATOMOBILI) [X] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 2; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9208898 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US4529068 (GALLO PHILLIP C [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 6; figure - *; | [A]US5355774 (DITLINGER RICHARD J [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5542504 (BERWANGER FRED W [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5542504 | US5485902 |