Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0991872
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.04.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] |
25.04.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] |
28.02.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.03.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] |
03.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.01.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
27.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.12.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
21.12.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
18.10.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
11.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
25.02.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
06.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|