blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0991872

EP0991872 - FASTENING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leitz GmbH & Co. KG
Leitzstrasse 2
73447 Oberkochen / DE
[2002/19]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Gebr. Leitz GmbH & Co.
Leitzstrasse 2
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STEIN, Dieter
Fraunhofer Strasse 9
D-73447 Oberkochen / DE
02 / KISSELBACH, Andreas
Hainbuchenweg 14
D-73447 Oberkochen / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98938640.424.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP03866
Priority number, dateDE1997211184U26.06.1997         Original published format: DE 29711184 U
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9900604
Date:07.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991872
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991872
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16D1/08, B23B31/30
[2000/15]
CPC:
B23B31/305 (EP); F16D1/0805 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SPANNVORRICHTUNG[2000/15]
English:FASTENING DEVICE[2000/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase23.11.1999National basic fee paid 
23.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
05.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2003Fee for grant paid
19.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Request for further processing for:14.12.2001Request for further processing filed
14.12.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.01.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB912646  (SCULLY JONES & CO) [A] 6-8* page 4, line 32 - line 53; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]FR2418055  (FOERENADE FABRIKSVERKEN [SE], et al) [A] 1,4,5,9 * page 6, line 14 - line 36; figure 5 *;
 [XY]GB2111172  (HURTH VERWALTUNGS GMBH) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5;
 [Y]DE29614727U  (SCHUNK FRITZ GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 14; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *
by applicantDE1913481
 US5237895
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.