EP0995022 - METHOD FOR FUEL INJECTION FOR STARTING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.A.S. 1 avenue Paul Ourliac, B.P. 1149 31036 Toulouse Cédex 01 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.A.S. 1 avenue Paul Ourliac, B.P. 1149 31036 Toulouse cedex 01 / FR | ||
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE S.A. Avenue du Mirail, Boîte Postale 1149 31036 Toulouse Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCA, Christian 9, rue des Mésanges F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | Zedlitz, Peter Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98938659.4 | 26.06.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998EP03924 | Priority number, date | FR19970008572 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9708572 | [2000/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902832 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995022 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995022 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D41/34 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
F02D41/345 (EP,US);
F02D41/06 (KR);
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/17] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE WÄHREND DES STARTS | [2000/17] | English: | METHOD FOR FUEL INJECTION FOR STARTING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2000/17] | French: | PROCEDE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT AU DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.10.2002 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3623042 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5390641 (YAMADA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 47 *; | [A]GB2233709 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 20 *; | [A]DE4317635 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5245972 (DENZ HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W * |