EP1005434 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PALLETIZING PACKING DRUMS ON A LOAD PLATFORM AND/OR DEPALLETIZING OF SAID PACKING DRUMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Till GmbH & Co. Kapellenstrasse 47-49 D-65830 Kriftel / DE | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKERT, Ulrich Winterbergstrasse 121 D-32602 Vlotho / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98938672.7 | 29.06.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998EP03958 | Priority number, date | DE19971028363 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728363 | DE19971051826 | 22.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19751826 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901362 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005434 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65G60/00 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
B65G1/00 (EP,US);
Y10S414/106 (EP,US);
Y10S414/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PALETTIEREN VON GEBINDEN AUF EINEN BELADUNGSTRÄGER UND/ODER ENTPALETTIEREN DIESER GEBINDE | [2000/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PALLETIZING PACKING DRUMS ON A LOAD PLATFORM AND/OR DEPALLETIZING OF SAID PACKING DRUMS | [2000/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PALETTISER DES FUTS SUR UN SUPPORT DE CHARGEMENT ET/OU DEPALETTISER LESDITS FUTS | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0385455 (PERSTORP AB [SE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 13 * * column 4, line 7 - line 9 * [A] 2,3; | [A]FR2514735 (BERTHELAT FILS ETS J [FR]) [A] 2,3 * figures 1-3 * |