Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8746198 | Global Dossier | 08.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | IL9800382 | 13.08.1998 | IL12155997 | 15.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1012012 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL9800382 | 13.08.1998 | IL12155997 | 15.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2300113 | 25.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL9800382 | 13.08.1998 | IL12155997 | 15.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0100050 | 28.05.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IL9800382 | 13.08.1998 | IL12155997 | 15.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9908908 | Global Dossier | 25.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL12155997 | 15.08.1997 |