EP1012012 - GEAR LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gear Protection Ltd. Derech Ben Gurion 16 Ramat Gan 52573 / IL | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VODA, Binyamin Pitchia Street 21 66559 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
DVILENSKY, Vladimir Sokolov Street 77 62284 Tel Aviv / IL | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard GB-London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98938878.0 | 13.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998IL00382 | Priority number, date | IL19970121559 | 15.08.1997 Original published format: IL 12155997 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908908 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012012 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/06, B60K41/26 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
B60R25/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2000/26] | Title | German: | GANGSCHALTHEBELDIEBSTAHLSICHERUNG | [2000/26] | English: | GEAR LOCK | [2000/26] | French: | ANTIVOL SUR SELECTEUR DE VITESSE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/40] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1394872 (MERCER WHITE JESSEE); | [X]US1498940 (ISIAH WHEELER WILLIAM); | [A]US1662099 (ANDERSON OLAF A); | [Y]US5269195 (KITAGAWARA HIROSHI [JP]); | [YP]US5685406 (CRUM BRUCE EDWARD [US], et al) |