EP1030369 - MULTICHIP MODULE STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKINE, Kenji, Chuo Kenkyusho, Hitachi, Ltd. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Hiroji, Chuo Kenkyusho, Hitachi, Ltd. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 03 /
YAMASAKI, Matsuo, Chuo Kenkyusho, Hitachi, Ltd. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kobubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 04 /
KAGAYA, Osamu, Chuo Kenkyusho, Hitachi, Ltd. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 05 /
YAMASHITA, Kiichi, Chuo Kenkyusho, Hitachi, Ltd. 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Hackney, Nigel John Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98938890.5 | 19.08.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998JP03668 | Priority number, date | JP19970222229 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22222997 | JP19970259589 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25958997 | JP19980069727 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6972798 | [2000/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909595 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030369 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030369 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/04 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
H01L25/04 (KR);
H01L23/5389 (EP,US);
H01L23/552 (EP,US);
H01L24/24 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/19 (EP);
H01L2224/24137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73267 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92244 (EP);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L23/3114 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15165 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15192 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/24227, H01L2924/15165 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2924/1306, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15165, H01L2924/15153 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2000/34] | Title | German: | MEHRCHIPMODULSTRUKTUR UND SEINE HERSTELLUNG | [2000/34] | English: | MULTICHIP MODULE STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2000/34] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MODULE A PUCES MULTIPLES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2000 | Translation filed | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.12.2007 | GB | 19.08.2008 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/27] | NL | 12.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0735806 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,7,10 * column 9, line 36 - column 11, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5656550 (TSUJI KAZUTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7,10 * column 21, line 35 - column 24, line 14; figures 29-32 *; | [A] - ROSZEL L E ET AL, "MCM prototyping using overlay interconnect process", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MULTI CHIP MODULE CONFERENCE (MCMC). SANTA CRUZ, MAR. 18 - 20, 1992, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19920318), vol. CONF. 1, ISBN 0-8186-2725-5, pages 36 - 39, XP010028005 [A] 8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCMC.1992.201441 | International search | [A]JPH0458539 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS5177173 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH07326708 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH06164088 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |