blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971032

EP0971032 - GROWTH PROMOTING MATERIAL FOR USEFUL MICROORGANISMS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NICHIMO COMPANY LIMITED
6-2, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEBE, Minoru
Nichimo Co., Ltd. 6-2, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
02 / MORIMOTO, Masakazu
Nichimo Co., Ltd. 6-2, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2000/02]Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al
Murgitroyd and Company, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date98938938.221.08.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP03719
Priority number, dateJP1997022529621.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22529697
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9910473
Date:04.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971032
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:C12N1/14, C12N1/20, C12N1/16
[2003/16]
CPC:
C07K14/415 (EP,US); C12N1/14 (EP,US); C12N1/20 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/02]C12N1/14, C12N1/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:WACHSTUMFÖRDERNDES MATERIAL FÜR NÜTZLICHE MIKROORGANISMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN.[2000/02]
English:GROWTH PROMOTING MATERIAL FOR USEFUL MICROORGANISMS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2000/02]
French:MATERIAU FAVORISANT LA CROISSANCE DE MICRO-ORGANISMES UTILES ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase18.05.1999Translation filed 
18.05.1999National basic fee paid 
18.05.1999Search fee paid 
18.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
15.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/06]
09.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PA]EP0834262  (NICHIMO KK [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPH0723725  (NICHIMO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPH0319686  (KIKKOMAN CORP);
 [Y]JPH07170938  (MATSUTANI KAGAKU KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH02289520  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.