EP1007633 - AVIAN PRIMORDIAL GERM CELL (PGC) CELL LINE AND A METHOD FOR LONG TERM CULTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts Institution of Higher Education of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Office of the Vice Chancellor for Research Amherst, MA 01002 / US | [2006/32] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states University of Massachusetts, a Public Institution of Higher Education of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts as represented by its Amherst Campus, Office of Vice Chancellor for Research at Amherst Amherst, MA 01002 / US | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states University of Massachusetts, a Public Institution of Higher Education of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts as represented by its Amherst Campus, Office of Vice Chancellor for Research at Amherst Amherst, MA 01002 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states University of Massachusetts, a Public Institution of Higher Education of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts represented by its Amherst Campus, Office of Vice Chancellor for Research at Amherst Amherst, MA 01002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONCE de LEON, F., Abel 2180 Folwell Avenue St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | 02 /
BLACKWELL, Catherine 285 Cutler Road Warren, MA 01083 / US | 03 /
GAO, Xiu, Ying 14 Ward Avenue S. Deerfield, MA 01373 / US | 04 /
ROBL, James, M. 196 Old Enfield Road Belchertown, MA 01007 / US | 05 /
STICE, Steven, L. 468 Amherst Road Belchertown, MA 01007 / US | 06 /
JERRY, D., Joseph W. Pelham Road Shutesbury, MA 01072 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98939101.6 | 04.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US15635 | Priority number, date | US19970905773 | 04.08.1997 Original published format: US 905773 | US19980127624 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: US 127624 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906533 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007633 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007633 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/02 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A01K67/0271 (EP,US);
C12N5/0611 (EP,US);
A01K2227/30 (EP,US);
C12N2501/105 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/125 (EP,US);
C12N2501/235 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | PRIMORDIALE KEIMZELLINIE AUS VÖGELN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN LANGZEITKULTIVIERUNG | [2000/24] | English: | AVIAN PRIMORDIAL GERM CELL (PGC) CELL LINE AND A METHOD FOR LONG TERM CULTURING THEREOF | [2000/24] | French: | LIGNEES DE CELLULES GERMINALES PRIMORDIALES D'OISEAU ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT DE MISE EN CULTURE PROLONGEE | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/24] | LIGNEES DE CELLULES SEXUELLES PRIMORDIALES D'OISEAU ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT DE MISE EN CULTURE PROLONGEE | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05022690.1 / EP1616943 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Request for further processing for: | 26.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2004 | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.10.2005 | FI | 19.10.2005 | IT | 19.10.2005 | NL | 19.10.2005 | DK | 19.01.2006 | GR | 19.01.2006 | SE | 19.01.2006 | PT | 20.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/16] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PONCE DE LEON F A ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN CHICKEN PRIMORDIAL GERM CELL TECHNOLOGY", REVISTA BRASILEIRA DE REPRODUCAO ANIMAL, BELO HORIZONTE, BR, (1997), vol. 21, no. 3, ISSN 0102-0803, pages 96 - 101, XP002913042 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - HAN J Y ET AL, "PRIMORDIAL GERM CELLS IN AVES - REVIEW -", ASIAN-AUSTRALASIAN JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCES, SUWEON, KR, (199412), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1011-2367, pages 459 - 466, XP002913030 [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - PONCE DE LEON F. A., ET AL., "RECENT ADVANCES IN CHICKEN PRIMORDIAL GERM CELL TECHNOLOGY.", REVISTA BRASILEIRA DE REPRODUCAO ANIMAL, BELO HORIZONTE, BR, BR, (19970101), vol. 21., no. 03., ISSN 0102-0803, pages 96 - 101., XP002913042 | [Y] - PAIN B., ET AL., "LONG-TERM IN VITRO CULTURE AND CHARACTERISATION OF AVIAN EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS WITH MULTIPLE MORPHOGENETIC POTENTIALITIES.", Development, The Company of Biologists Ltd., GB, GB, (19960801), vol. 122., ISSN 0950-1991, pages 2239 - 2248., XP002913043 |