EP1003422 - DETACHABLE ANEURYSM NECK BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEN, Christopher, G., M. 652 West Hillsdale Boulevard San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 02 /
HAN, Thuzar, K. 37620 Murietta Terrace Fremont, CA 94587 / US | 03 /
HUI, Matthew, Yingwing 799 Golden Creek Terrace San Jose, CA 95111 / US | 04 /
HO, Liem 2235 California Street 157 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98939251.9 | 04.08.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998US16367 | Priority number, date | US19970055566P | 13.08.1997 Original published format: US 55566 P | US19980126705 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: US 126705 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908607 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003422 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003422 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/12113 (EP,US);
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B17/1214 (EP,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2000/22] | Title | German: | ABLÖSBARES SYSTEM ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES ANEURYSMASHALSES | [2000/22] | English: | DETACHABLE ANEURYSM NECK BRIDGE | [2000/22] | French: | PONT DETACHABLE DE COLLET D'ANEVRISME | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 21.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9726939 (MICROVENA CORP [US], et al) [X] 17,18,22-24 * page 22, paragraph 3; figure 6 * [A] 1; | [XA]DE9413645U (SCHNEIDT BERNHARD ING GRAD [DE]) [X] 17,30 * figures 2,4 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0719522 (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,25 * the whole document *; | [A]US4710192 (LIOTTA DOMINGO S [AR], et al) [A] 1,30 * figures 2B,3 *; | [A]DD233303 (UNIV BERLIN HUMBOLDT [DD]); | [A]FR2678508 (CELSA LG [FR]) | by applicant | WO9816265 | US4994069 | US4739768 | US5669931 | US5261916 | US5250071 |