EP1011342 - METHODS FOR PRESERVING FRESH FRUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/26] | METHODS FOR PRESERVING FRESH FRUIT AND PRODUCT THEREOF | ||
[2011/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mantrose-Haeuser Co. Inc. 113 Olive Street Attleboro, MA 02073 / US | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY OF AGRICULTURE Washington, DC 20250-1400 / US | [2011/32] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Mantrose-Haeuser Co. Inc. 113 Olive Street Attleboro, MA 02073 / US | ||
For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY OF AGRICULTURE Washington, DC 20250-1400 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chao 83 Holden Street Shrewbury, MA 01545 / US | 02 /
TREZZA, Thomas, A. 5478 Preston View Blvd. 1003 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | 03 /
WONG, Dominic, W., S. 941 Liberty Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | 04 /
CAMIRAND, Wayne, M. 844 Madison Albany, CA 94706 / US | 05 /
PAVLATH, Attila, E. 409 Tampico Drive Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2000/34] | 01 /
CHEN, Chao 83 Holden Street Shrewbury, MA 01545 / US | ||
02 /
TREZZA, Thomas, A. 5478 Preston View Blvd. #1003 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | |||
03 /
WONG, Dominic, W., S. 941 Liberty Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | |||
04 /
CAMIRAND, Wayne, M. 844 Madison Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
05 /
PAVLATH, Attila, E. 409 Tampico Drive Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US | |||
Former [2000/26] | 01 /
CHEN, Chao 83 Holden Street Shrewbury, MA 01545 / US | ||
02 /
TREZZA, Thomas, A. Apartment K, 3320 Northwood Drive Concord, CA 94520 / US | |||
03 /
WONG, Dominic, W., S. 941 Liberty Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | |||
04 /
CAMIRAND, Wayne, M. 844 Madison Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
05 /
PAVLATH, Attila, E. 409 Tampico Drive Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98939325.1 | 10.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US16616 | Priority number, date | US19970909196 | 11.08.1997 Original published format: US 909196 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907230 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011342 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1011342 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/153, A23L3/3454, A23B7/157, A23B7/158, A23B7/154, A23B7/10, A23B9/26, A23B9/30 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23B7/153 (KR);
A23B7/157 (EP,US);
A23L3/3481 (EP,US);
Y02A40/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | A23B7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HALTBARMACHUNG FRISCHER FRUECHTE | [2011/14] | English: | METHODS FOR PRESERVING FRESH FRUIT | [2011/14] | French: | PROCEDES DE CONSERVATION DE FRUITS FRAIS | [2011/14] |
Former [2000/26] | VERFAHREN ZUR HALTBARMACHUNG FRISCHER FRUECHTE SOWIE DESSEN PRODUKTE | ||
Former [2000/26] | METHODS FOR PRESERVING FRESH FRUIT AND PRODUCT THEREOF | ||
Former [2000/26] | PROCEDES DE CONSERVATION DE FRUITS FRAIS ET LEUR PRODUIT | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 21.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10011434.7 / EP2279675 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2003 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07322862 ; | [A]ES2092446 ; | [X]US3764348 (HUXSOLL C, et al) [X] 1-10,14-16,22,23 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1455986 (GEN FOODS CORP) [X] 21* page 1, line 43 - line 73; example . *; | [A]GB2100575 (STOKES BOMFORD [GB]) [A] 21 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3624035 (ORGANOGEN MEDIZINISCH MOLEKULA [DE]) [X] 1-8,22,23 * example - *; | [X]WO9412041 (LIDDEN ALEXANDER STUART [AU]) [X] 1-8,10-23 * page 7, line 3 - line 13 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1; examples 3,4,16; claims 1,4,6-8,12 * * page 5, paragraph 2 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07322862 A 19951212 (YAMAKI KK) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 02, Database accession no. 1997-014144, XP002191824 & ES2092446 A 19961116 (PAPANOVA SL) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3754938 (PONTONG J); | [Y]US4011348 (FARRIER RAY W, et al); | [X]US4988522 (WARREN BETH Z [US]) |