EP0994766 - STOP DEVICE FOR MITRE-BOX SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FESTO Tooltechnic GmbH & Co. Wertstrasse 20 73240 Wendlingen / DE | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states KARL M. REICH MASCHINENFABRIK GmbH Kisslingstrasse 1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINES, Wolfgang Bildäckerstrasse 3 D-72664 Kohlberg / DE | 02 /
FREY, Hermann Mühlstrasse 11/3 D-72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Reimold, Otto Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Reimold, Otto, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98939617.1 | 04.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998EP04147 | Priority number, date | DE1997129552 | 10.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19729552 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902317 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994766 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994766 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B27G5/02, B27B27/06, B27B27/10 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B27G5/023 (EP);
B27B27/06 (EP);
B27B27/08 (EP);
B27B27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [2000/17] | Title | German: | ANSCHLAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GEHRUNGSSÄGE | [2000/17] | English: | STOP DEVICE FOR MITRE-BOX SAW | [2000/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BUTEE POUR SCIE A ONGLET | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.07.2001 | IT | 18.07.2001 | NL | 18.07.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 18.07.2001 | |
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 18.07.2001 | |
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | FR | 21.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE299296 (KAWALLE) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 2,15-17; | [Y]GB191225792 (PETTINGELL MACHINE COMPANY [US], et al) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]US1704747 (ANTON KOPECKY); | [X]US3901498 (NOVAK EDWARD P) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3043037 (HIRSH CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4,15,16 * figures 1-7 *; | [XY]US5402701 (INGRAM STANLEY J [US]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [AD]US5473821 (DIMARCO JOHN [US]); | [Y]EP0752300 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 2,15-17 * the whole document * |