EP1007203 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIARYLCARBONATES USING CATALYSTS CONTAINING A PLATINUM GROUP METAL PRODUCED IN A SOL-GEL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/24] | CATALYSTS CONTAINING A PLATINUM GROUP METAL AND PRODUCED IN A SOL-GEL METHOD, AS WELL AS METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIARYLCARBONATES | ||
[2004/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSE, Carsten Hülserheide 48 D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 02 /
NOTHEIS, Ulrich Goethestrasse 65 D-41539 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
RECHNER, Johann Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 2 D-47906 Kempen / DE | [2000/30] |
Former [2000/24] | 01 /
HESSE, Carsten Buschstrasse 151 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | ||
02 /
NOTHEIS, Ulrich Goethestrasse 65 D-41539 Dormagen / DE | |||
03 /
RECHNER, Johann Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 2 D-47906 Kempen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98939655.1 | 05.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998EP04862 | Priority number, date | DE1997135770 | 18.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735770 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908787 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007203 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007203 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/56, B01J23/656, C07C68/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
B01J37/036 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07C68/01 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/01, C07C69/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT, NL [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIARYLCARBONATEN MITTELS AUS EINEM SOL-GEL VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTEN PLATINMETALL ENTHALTENDEN KATALYSATOR | [2004/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIARYLCARBONATES USING CATALYSTS CONTAINING A PLATINUM GROUP METAL PRODUCED IN A SOL-GEL METHOD | [2004/11] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE DIARYLCARBONATES EN PRESENCE DE CATALYSEURS CONTENANT UN METAL DU GROUPE DU PLATINE ET PREPARES A PARTIR D'UN PROCEDE SOL-GEL | [2004/11] |
Former [2000/24] | AUS EINEM SOL-GEL VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE PLATINMETALL ENTHALTENDE KATALYSATOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIARYLCARBONATEN | ||
Former [2000/24] | CATALYSTS CONTAINING A PLATINUM GROUP METAL AND PRODUCED IN A SOL-GEL METHOD, AS WELL AS METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIARYLCARBONATES | ||
Former [2000/24] | CATALYSEURS CONTENANT UN METAL DU GROUPE DU PLATINE ET PREPARES A PARTIR D'UN PROCEDE SOL-GEL, ET PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE DIARYLCARBONATES | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0602865 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * example 6 *; | [X]EP0177198 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [X] 1 * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 21; examples 20,23 *; | [X]EP0745426 (SOLVAY [BE]) [X] 1 * example 1 *; | [X]JPS60202829 ; | [DA]EP0736325 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860313), vol. 010, no. 063, Database accession no. (C - 332), & JP60202829 A 19851014 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN;OTHERS: 0J) [X] 1 * abstract * |