EP0975405 - USE OF AEROGELS AS ADSORPTION AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION 75 State Street Boston, MA 02109-1806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEVERS, Werner Inselsbergstrasse 9 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Andreas Im Dürren Kopf 72a D-64347 Driesheim / DE | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98940072.6 | 17.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998EP02283 | Priority number, date | DE1997116372 | 18.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716372 | DE1997119395 | 07.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719395 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9847594 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0975405 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975405 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
B01J20/28047 (EP);
B01J20/10 (KR);
B01D15/00 (EP);
B01D53/02 (EP);
B01D53/04 (EP);
B01J20/28057 (EP);
C02F1/281 (EP);
C12P35/06 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/104 (EP);
B01D2253/106 (EP);
B01D2253/112 (EP);
B01D2253/304 (EP);
B01D2253/306 (EP);
B01D2253/308 (EP);
B01D2253/311 (EP);
B01D2257/2064 (EP);
B01D2257/302 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (EP);
B01D2257/406 (EP);
B01D2257/502 (EP);
B01D2257/7027 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2258/00 (EP);
B01D2259/40088 (EP);
B01D2259/4533 (EP);
C02F2101/32 (EP);
C02F2101/322 (EP);
C02F2101/36 (EP);
C02F2101/363 (EP);
Y02P20/151 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON AEROGELEN ALS ADSORPTIONSMITTEL | [2000/05] | English: | USE OF AEROGELS AS ADSORPTION AGENTS | [2000/05] | French: | UTILISATION D'AEROGELS COMME AGENT D'ADSORPTION | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 06.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06001672.2 / EP1690593 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.03.2006 | NL | 29.03.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | SE | 29.06.2006 | ES | 10.07.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | NL | 29.03.2006 | |
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 29.06.2006 | |
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SE | 29.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9625950 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7,9 * example 13 *; | [A]EP0171722 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,8 * page 3, line 18 - line 26 *; | [A]WO9619607 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,9,14 *; | [A]WO9625850 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9 * page 4, paragraph 2 * | Examination | WO9528220 |