EP1002080 - FLUORESCENT PROTEINS AS CELL-TYPE SPECIFIC REPORTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Correction of patent specification | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIOGENESIS AG Josef-Stelzmann-Strasse 50, Containergebäude 50931 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states AXIOGENESIS AG Josef-Stelzmann-Strasse 50, Containergebäude 50931 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states AXIOGENESIS AG Auerstrasse 4 50733 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Hescheler, Jürgen Eckdorfer Strasse 7 50968 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESCHELER Jürgen Eckdorfer Strasse 7 50968 Köln / DE | [2003/22] |
Former [2000/21] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke Patentanwälte PartG mbB Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Knauthe Eggers Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 31 01 40 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Behnisch, Werner, Dr., et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Helbing, Jörg, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98940092.4 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998EP03988 | Priority number, date | DE19971027962 | 02.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19727962 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901552 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002080 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002080 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1002080 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, G01N33/50, A01K67/027 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
C12N5/0603 (EP,US);
C07K14/43595 (EP,US);
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDE PROTEINE ALS ZELLTYPSPEZIFISCHE REPORTER | [2000/21] | English: | FLUORESCENT PROTEINS AS CELL-TYPE SPECIFIC REPORTER | [2000/21] | French: | PROTEINES FLUORESCENTES UTILISEES COMME RAPPORTEURS SPECIFIQUES DU TYPE CELLULAIRE | [2000/21] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 27.10.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - ZERNICKA-GOETZ M ET AL., "Following cell fate in the living mouse embryo", DEVELOPMENT, cambridge,uk, (199703), vol. 124, no. 6, pages 1133 - 1137, XP002086618 [X] 1-3,6-9,11 * the whole document * | [Y] - WOBUS A M ET AL, "RETINOIC ACID INDUCES EXPRESSION OF THE VENTRICULAR 2.1 KB MYOSIN-LIGHT-CHAIN-2 PROMOTER DURING IN VITRO CARDIOGENESIS OF EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS", CIRCULATION, (19951015), vol. 92, no. 8, SUPPL. 01, page I114, XP002001047 [Y] 1-9,11-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - LI Y ET AL, ""USE OF A GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN IN STUDIES OF APOPTOSIS OF TRANSFECTED CELLLS"", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1997), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1026 - 1029, XP002068179 [Y] 1-9,11-13 * page 1027, paragraph L * | [A] - WOBUS A M ET AL, "IN VITRO DIFFERENTIATION OF EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS INTO CARDIOMYOCYTES OR SKELETAL MUSCLE CELLS IS SPECIFICALLY MODULATED BY RETINOIC ACID", ROUX'S ARCHIVES OF DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (199410), vol. 204, no. 1, pages 36 - 45, XP000196431 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00744871 | [AD] - IKAWA M ET AL., "Green fluorescent protein as amarker in transgenic mice", DEVELOPMENT GROWTH & DIFFERENTIATION, (199508), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 455 - 459, XP002086829 [AD] 10 * page 455, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1440-169X.1995.t01-2-00012.x | Examination | WO9836081 | - ZHUO, L. ET AL, "Live astrocytes visualized by green fluorescent protein in transgenic mice", DEV BIOL, (19970701), vol. 187, no. 1, pages 36 - 42 |