EP1016209 - COMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radioscape Limited 34 Mornington Crescent London NW1 7RE / GB | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRIS, Gavin Robert, Radioscape Limited 34 Mornington Crescent London NW1 7RE / GB | 02 /
FLORENCE, Peter Charles, Radioscape Limited 34 Mornington Crescent London NW1 7RE / GB | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Langley, Peter James, et al Origin Limited Twisden Works Twisden Road London NW5 1DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Langley, Peter James, et al Origin Limited, 52 Muswell Hill Road London N10 3JR / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Kidd, Piers Burgess, et al Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Field London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940409.0 | 27.08.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998GB02583 | Priority number, date | GB19970018131 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9718131 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910976 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016209 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016209 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03C1/00, H03C5/00, H03D1/00, H03D5/00 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H03J3/08 (EP);
H03J1/0008 (EP);
H04B1/16 (EP);
H04B1/406 (EP);
H04H40/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT | [2000/27] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS | [2000/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Request for further processing for: | 13.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2003 | BE | 11.06.2003 | CH | 11.06.2003 | FI | 11.06.2003 | IT | 11.06.2003 | LI | 11.06.2003 | NL | 11.06.2003 | CY | 27.08.2003 | LU | 27.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | SE | 11.09.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 27.08.2003 | ||
LU | 27.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.08.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 27.08.2003 | ||
LU | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH08297563 ; | [Y]JPH0795175 ; | [YA]EP0276932 (NORSAT INTERNATIONAL INC [CA]) [Y] 6,7,12-15,24,25,28-33 * the whole document * [A] 1-17; | [XY]US4977607 (MAUCKSCH THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 18-23,27 * column 3, lines 19-43; figure 1 * [Y] 17,24-26,28-33; | [XY]US5115201 (ASPLUND MARK D [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 29; figure 1 * * abstract * [Y] 3,5,7,10,12-15,17; | [YA]EP0486095 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 26 * the whole document * [A] 1-34; | [XY]EP0501829 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11,16 * page 3, lines 42-57; figures 1,8 * [Y] 3,5-7,10,12-15,17; | [A]US5357221 (MATERO JORMA [FI]) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [A]US5589833 (RANDALL MITCHELL A [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08297563 A 19961112 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07095175 A 19950407 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 5,10,12,13 * abstract * |