EP0935721 - VALVE SPINDLE ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EJA Engineering Limited Blanchard Works, Hindley Green Industrial Estate Wigan WN2 4HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states EJA Engineering Limited Blanchard Works, Hindley Green Industrial Estate Wigan, Lancashire WN2 4HR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADSWORTH, Martin, James Alderbrook, Greenfield Farm Atherton, Manchester M29 8LZ / GB | 02 /
FOSTER, Stephen, Leslie New Springs Farm, Saccary Lane Mellor, Blackburn BB1 9FL / GB | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940422.3 | 28.08.1998 | [1999/33] | WO1998GB02597 | Priority number, date | GB19970019106 | 10.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9719106 | GB19980014716 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9814716 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913254 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0935721 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/60 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
F16K31/602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/33] | Title | German: | VENTILSPINDEL-BETÄTIGUNG | [1999/33] | English: | VALVE SPINDLE ACTUATOR | [1999/33] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DE TIGE DE SOUPAPE | [1999/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 18.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]AT224993B (KOENIG & BAUER SCHNELLPRESSFAB) [A] 1 * figure 1 * [X] 12,16; | [A]US3383944 (GEE SKINNER HARVEY) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE2841721 (NORBRO ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE1870253U (ALBERT MUEHLENBERG APPBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * |