EP1009418 - ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA LECTIN AND ITS USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alizyme Therapeutics Limited 280 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Alizyme Therapeutics Limited 280 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road, Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUSZTAI, Arpad Janos, Rowett Research Institute Greenburn Road Bucksburn, Aberdeen AB2 9SB / GB | 02 /
BARDOCZ, Zsuszanna Magdolna, Rowett Res. Services Greenburn Road Bucksburn, Aberdeen AB2 9SB / GB | 03 /
PALMER, Richard Michael John, Alizyme Thera. Ltd. 280 Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 04 /
FISH, Neil William, Alizyme Therapeutics Limited 280 Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge C4 4WE / GB | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940437.1 | 28.08.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998GB02612 | Priority number, date | GB19970018413 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9718413 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911278 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009418 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009418 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78, A61K38/16 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
A61K38/168 (EP);
A61K36/48 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA LEKTIN UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN | [2001/24] | English: | ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA LECTIN AND ITS USES | [2000/25] | French: | LECTINE DE ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2001/24] |
Former [2000/25] | ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA LEKTIN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2000/25] | LECTINE DE $i(ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA) ET SES UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.2002 | BE | 27.03.2002 | CH | 27.03.2002 | FI | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | LI | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | IE | 28.08.2002 | LU | 28.08.2002 | CY | 31.08.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 28.08.2002 | ||
CY | 31.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 28.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 28.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]RU1799599 ; | [X]JPS61280432 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 19, Database accession no. 94-157940, XP002086657 & SU1799599 A 19930307 (LVOV MED INST) [X] 1,6,13-16,18,23,27 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 04, Database accession no. 87-024774, XP002086658 & JPS61280432 A 19861211 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [XD] - JOSIANE WANTYGHEM ET AL., "PURIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF ROBINIA PSEUDOACACIA SEED LECTINS", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (19860715), vol. 237, no. 2, pages 483 - 489, XP002086656 [XD] 1-28 * the whole document * |